In this article ‘**Multiplication Made Simple**‘ we’ll discuss all the short tricks that we can apply to find results or products faster. Multiplications are a very basic building block for quantitative aptitude.

Multiplication Made Simple is very necessary for understanding and doing maths. It’s advisable to have a thorough grip on multiplication which will be helpful in understanding other aspects like maths tables, percentages, fractions, squares, cubes, ratios, etc.

Nowadays competitive exams are asking questions in which complex calculations, in which if we remember and perform **faster multiplication** then it’ll help in faster-solving problems and it’ll be helpful in attempting more questions in a short span of time.

Table of Contents

## What is Multiplication?

Multiplication is one of the four basic operations that are performed in Arithmetic. The end result of a multiplication operation is known as the **Product**.

Multiplication is considered the same as repeated addition on any one number for second number times. For example if we multiply 3 x 4 then in form of addition it can be written as: 3 + 3 + 3 + 3 or 4 + 4 + 4. The end result of addition or multiplication is the same which is 12. 12 is known as a product of 3 multiplied by 4 or 4 multiplied by 3.

Multiplication of numbers we’ve learned in many different ways, we’ll learn here to **simplify multiplication**, for faster calculation. Below are the **short tricks for multiplication made simple**:

### Addition Method

#### Multiplication of Two Digits

In addition method for multiplication, we’ll understand the multiply of two-digit numbers ‘AB’ and ‘CD’.

1) AB

x CD

i) B x D = BD

ii) B x C + A x D = XY

iii) A x C = AC

The product will be the addition of BD, XY, and AC as shown below:

B D

X Y

A C

A (X+C) (B+Y) D

Let’s understand this method with the help of the below example of Multiplying 45 x 78: we’ll assign letters with digits as, A=4, B=5, C=7, and D=8

i) 5 x 8 = 40 {BD}

ii) 5 x 7 + 4 x 8 = 35 + 32 = 67 {On Applying BODMAS Rule.} {67}.

iii) 4 x 7 = 28 {AC}

Now Product of multiplying 45 x 78 will be calculated as below:

4 0

6 7

2 8

2 (6+8)(4+7) 0

4+7 = 11 so 1 will be carried to (6+8)+1.

6+8+1 = 15, here also 1 will be carried to the next number, i.e. 2.

2+1 = 3

3510 is the product of this multiplication.

#### Multiplication Made Simple of Three Digits

In addition method for multiplication, we’ll understand the multiply of two-digit numbers ‘ABC’ and ‘DEF’.

1) ABC

x DEF

i) C x F = CF

ii) B x F + C x E = XX

iii) A x F + C x D + B x E = YY

iv) A x E + B x D = ZZ

v) A x D = AD

The product will be the addition of CF, XX, YY, ZZ, and AD as shown below:

C F

X X

Y Y

Z Z

A D

=A(Z+D)(Y+Z)(X+Y)(C+X)F

### Multiplication made simple by Middle Number

Multiplication Made Simple with the help of the middle number if the difference between the two numbers is not big. In this trick, we’ll need to remember the square of numbers.

Let’s understand this method with the help of the below example:

=> Multiply 64 x 56

Find a middle number of 64 and 56, that is 60.

Find the square root of the middle number and the difference between a middle number and the original number which is 4.

=> (60)^{2} – (4)^{2}

=> 3600 – 16

=> 3584 {Product of 64 x 56.}

### Multiplication made simple by Base 100

Multiplication can be done with the help of the 100 bases if the difference between the two numbers is not big and both numbers is greater than 100. Let’s understand this method with the help of the below example:

=> Multiply 104 x 109

=> Let’s split 104 as 100 + 4.

=> Let’s split 109 as 100 + 9.

=> Now multiply 4 x 9 = 36. {**Note**: if the number is greater than 99 then that number will be added to the next number.}

=> Add 104 + 9 or 109 + 4 = 113.

=> Product will be 11336.

## Practice Multiplication

Is very essential to practice multiplication with above shown short tricks to memorize methods and perform them quickly in exams. Solving questions again and again with the tricks of multiplication made simple will help in memorizing and performing better. sBelow are a few **multiplication questions for practice**:

- 10 x 14
- 15 x 19
- 23 x 27
- 101 x 102
- 115 x 121
- 21 x 19
- 567 x 452
- 254 x 965
- 754 x 821
- 111 x 333

## Final Words

Practicing the above questions for **multiplication made simple** is not the end, but it’s the start of a new journey to multiply numbers in a new and faster way. For cracking competitive exams one must practice multiplication daily and without a calculator.